House | 03/15/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on March 15, 2022. | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-184. | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Engrossed | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 59 | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 58 | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |