House
|
04/07/2022
|
Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 5:36 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Assigned Act No. 2022-434.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Clerk of the House Certification
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurred in Second House Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Oliver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 967
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 661
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Healthcare Amendment Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 75
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 74
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Oliver Amendment Offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
|
|
|