House | 04/05/2022 | Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 3:29 p.m. | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-293. | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 882 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Concurrence Requested | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Sessions motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 896 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Cosponsors Added | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 332 | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |