House
|
04/05/2022
|
Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Assigned Act No. 2022-392.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Concurred in Second House Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Clerk of the House Certification
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote 921
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 922
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Orr Amendment Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Third Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 290
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 289
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Drummond Amendment Offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 288
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Education Policy Amendment Offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
|
|
|