House | 03/30/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-251. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 778 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Lawrence intended to vote "Yea" | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 169 | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |