House
|
04/07/2022
|
Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 6:15 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Assigned Act No. 2022-351.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Clerk of the House Certification
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurred in Second House Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Ingram motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 973
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1043
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1042
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Albritton Amendment Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Albritton motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Dismukes intended to vote "Yea"
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 434
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 433
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|