House | 04/07/2022 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p.m. on April 7, 2022. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-439. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1093 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 533 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 532 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Givan Amendment Offered | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |