House | 03/17/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-150. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 17, 2022 at 1:50 p.m. on March 17, 2022. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Singleton motion to adopt Local Certification Resolution adopted Roll Call 649 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 648 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 454 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 453 | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |