Alabama 2022 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB80 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 1 HB80
2-2 215767-2
2+2 215767-1
33 3 By Representatives Lee, Clouse, Grimsley and Sorrells (N & P)
44 4 RFD: Local Legislation
55 5 First Read: 11-JAN-22
66
7-Page 0 HB80
8-1
9-2 ENROLLED, An Act,
10-3 Relating to Houston County; to amend Section
11-4 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the salary of the
12-5 Houston County Sheriff.
13-6 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
14-7 Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975,
15-8 is amended to read as follows:
16-9 "§45-35-70.
17-10 "(a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation
18-11 of the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be
19-12 adjusted so that the monthly compensation paid to the holders
20-13 of the offices shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation
21-14 which was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on
22-15 April 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this
23-16 subdivision shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
24-17 the beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise
25-18 provided by law, at which time the amount of the expense
26-19 allowance shall be included in the base salary for the office
27-20 holders and the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions
28-21 from the expense allowance provided in this subsection shall
29-22 be made in the same manner as if the expense allowance were
30-23 salary as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
31-24 "(2) Beginning on June 1, 2015 the effective date of
32-25 this act, the annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County
33-Page 1 HB80
34-1 shall be 89 percent of the salary of the Judge of Probate of
35-2 Houston County on June 1, 2015 one hundred twenty thousand
36-3 dollars ($120,000). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
37-4 thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. Any The
38-5 increase in compensation in provided by this subdivision over
39-6 the salary of the sheriff existing before the effective date
40-7 of this act shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
41-8 the beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise
42-9 provided by law, at which time the that amount shall be
43-10 included in the base salary for the office holder sheriff, and
44-11 the expense allowance shall be void.
45-12 "(3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the
46-13 expense allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston
47-14 County Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1),
48-15 shall only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
49-16 "(b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
50-17 commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
51-18 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
52-19 thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
53-20 2A, Title 11, is hereby ratified and confirmed and shall
54-21 continue to be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston
55-22 County Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
56-23 compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
57-24 only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
58-25 in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
59-Page 2 HB80
60-1 "(2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
61-2 commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
62-3 expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
63-4 ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
64-5 performing duties within Houston County.
65-6 "(3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
66-7 Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
67-8 in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
68-9 performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
69-10 provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
70-11 reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
71-12 vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
72-13 manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
73-14 received by the chair of the county commission."
74-15 Section 2. This act shall become effective on the
75-16 first day of the first month following its passage and
76-17 approval by the Governor, or its otherwise becoming law.
77-Page 3 HB80
78-1
7+Page 0 1 215767-1:n:11/30/2021:PMG/bm LSA2021-2461
798 2
809 3
8110 4
82-Speaker of the House of Representatives
83-
8411 5
85-6 President and Presiding Officer of the Senate
86-House of Representatives7
87-I hereby certify that the within Act originated in8
88-9 and was passed by the House 08-FEB-22.
89-10
90-11 Jeff Woodard
91-12 Clerk
92-13
93- 14
94- 15
95-Senate16 24-FEB-22 Passed
96- 17
97-Page 4
12+6
13+7
14+8
15+9 A BILL
16+10 TO BE ENTITLED
17+11 AN ACT
18+12
19+13 Relating to Houston County; to amend Section
20+14 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the salary of the
21+15 Houston County Sheriff.
22+16 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
23+17 Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975,
24+18 is amended to read as follows:
25+19 "§45-35-70.
26+20 "(a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation
27+21 of the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be
28+22 adjusted so that the monthly compensation paid to the holders
29+23 of the offices shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation
30+24 which was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on
31+25 April 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this
32+26 subdivision shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
33+27 the beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise
34+Page 1 1 provided by law, at which time the amount of the expense
35+2 allowance shall be included in the base salary for the office
36+3 holders and the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions
37+4 from the expense allowance provided in this subsection shall
38+5 be made in the same manner as if the expense allowance were
39+6 salary as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
40+7 "(2) Beginning on June 1, 2015 the effective date of
41+8 this act, the annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County
42+9 shall be 89 percent of the salary of the Judge of Probate of
43+10 Houston County on June 1, 2015 one hundred twenty thousand
44+11 dollars ($120,000). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
45+12 thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. Any The
46+13 increase in compensation in provided by this subdivision over
47+14 the salary of the sheriff existing before the effective date
48+15 of this act shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
49+16 the beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise
50+17 provided by law, at which time the that amount shall be
51+18 included in the base salary for the office holder sheriff, and
52+19 the expense allowance shall be void.
53+20 "(3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the
54+21 expense allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston
55+22 County Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1),
56+23 shall only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
57+24 "(b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
58+25 commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
59+26 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
60+27 thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
61+Page 2 1 2A, Title 11, is hereby ratified and confirmed and shall
62+2 continue to be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston
63+3 County Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
64+4 compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
65+5 only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
66+6 in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
67+7 "(2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
68+8 commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
69+9 expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
70+10 ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
71+11 performing duties within Houston County.
72+12 "(3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
73+13 Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
74+14 in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
75+15 performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
76+16 provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
77+17 reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
78+18 vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
79+19 manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
80+20 received by the chair of the county commission."
81+21 Section 2. This act shall become effective on the
82+22 first day of the first month following its passage and
83+23 approval by the Governor, or its otherwise becoming law.
84+Page 3