Alabama 2022 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB80 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/24/2022

                            1 HB80
2 215767-2
3 By Representatives Lee, Clouse, Grimsley and Sorrells (N & P)
4 RFD: Local Legislation 
5 First Read: 11-JAN-22 
 
Page 0 HB80
1 
2 ENROLLED, An Act,
3	Relating to Houston County; to amend Section
4 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the salary of the
5 Houston County Sheriff.
6 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
7	Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975,
8 is amended to read as follows:
9	"§45-35-70.
10	"(a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation
11 of the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be
12 adjusted so that the monthly compensation paid to the holders
13 of the offices shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation
14 which was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on
15 April 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this
16 subdivision shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
17 the beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise
18 provided by law, at which time the amount of the expense
19 allowance shall be included in the base salary for the office
20 holders and the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions
21 from the expense allowance provided in this subsection shall
22 be made in the same manner as if the expense allowance were
23 salary as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
24	"(2) Beginning on June 1, 2015 the effective date of
25 this act, the annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County
Page 1 HB80
1 shall be 89 percent of the salary of the Judge of Probate of
2 Houston County on June 1, 2015 one hundred twenty thousand
3 dollars ($120,000). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
4 thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. Any The
5 increase in compensation in provided by this subdivision over
6 the salary of the sheriff existing before the effective date
7 of this act shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until
8 the beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise
9 provided by law, at which time the that amount shall be
10 included in the base salary for the office holder sheriff, and
11 the expense allowance shall be void.
12	"(3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the
13 expense allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston
14 County Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1),
15 shall only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
16	"(b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
17 commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
18 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
19 thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
20 2A, Title 11, is hereby ratified and confirmed and shall
21 continue to be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston
22 County Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
23 compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
24 only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
25 in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
Page 2 HB80
1	"(2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
2 commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
3 expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
4 ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
5 performing duties within Houston County.
6	"(3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
7 Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
8 in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
9 performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
10 provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
11 reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
12 vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
13 manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
14 received by the chair of the county commission."
15	Section 2. This act shall become effective on the
16 first day of the first month following its passage and
17 approval by the Governor, or its otherwise becoming law.
Page 3 HB80
1 
2 
3  
4 
Speaker of the House of Representatives
 
5  
6 President and Presiding Officer of the Senate 
House of Representatives7
I hereby certify that the within Act originated in8
9 and was passed by the House 08-FEB-22.
10 
11	Jeff Woodard
12	Clerk
13 
 14  
 15  
Senate16	24-FEB-22	Passed
 17  
Page 4