Senate | 03/31/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-265. | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 549 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 548 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Givhan Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |