Senate | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-409. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 991 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Hill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 990 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 252 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |