Senate | 03/10/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-145. | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 37 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |