House | 05/26/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt INS0ZZ-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Education Policy INS0ZZ-1 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Education Policy | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Add Cosponsor | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Education Policy | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Education Policy | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |