House | 04/27/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |