House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Add Cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Adopt LHGKWY-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Adopt CYRVQW-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education CYRVQW-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education S2KE85-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 7Q5SE2-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education VUQWLP-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education UB85DX-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|