House | 05/25/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Add Cosponsor | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Adopt QIRF11-1 | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Adopt JRMBYN-1 | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security JRMBYN-1 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |