House | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund RHDGYM-1 | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means General Fund | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt U71YGG-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Healthcare U71YGG-1 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |