House | 05/23/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | No Recommendation by House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Adopt FGP655-1 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Carry Over | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |