Senate | 05/24/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |