House | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt OAK2JJ-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt YAXH66-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary YAXH66-1 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |