Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Adopt 1XDRL3-1 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary 1XDRL3-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary 4L0233-1 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Adopt 8TLQFH-1 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Adopt TDT211-1 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |