Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Adopt 1FSELL-1 | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 1FSELL-1 | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means Education | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |