House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 417
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 180
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 179 NYG4TT8-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
W&MGF Reported Substitute Offered from House Ways and Means General Fund NYG4TT8-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted NYG4TT8-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted 9TRHBPM-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Prefiled
|
|
|