House
|
04/16/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 449
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 176
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 175 UNNBDDD-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Lovvorn Amendment Offered UNNBDDD-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 174 1UXP3L3-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
PS&HS Reported Substitute Offered from House Public Safety and Homeland Security 1UXP3L3-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 1UXP3L3-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted W8VY5E9-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|