Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Pending Senate Education Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 734
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 733 1CDT3ZL-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Rafferty 1st Amendment Offered 1CDT3ZL-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Harrison 1st Amendment Offered BFTG4J4-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 732 VXB4VLV-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Drummond 1st Amendment Offered VXB4VLV-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 731 YUXP22N-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered YUXP22N-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Education Policy YUXP22N-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Education Policy 1st Amendment EX7EC2C-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending House Education Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|