Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 19 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Pending House Insurance | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Insurance |