Senate | 05/02/2024 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 819 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |