Senate | 05/08/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 290 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Lovvorn motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 289 WUB6E59-1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Robbins 1st Amendment Offered WUB6E59-1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |