House | 05/10/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 974 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 277 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 276 8XGLHHH-1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Montgomery County Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered 8XGLHHH-1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Montgomery County Legislation 8XGLHHH-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Montgomery County Legislation 1st Amendment USJIGXG-1 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Pending House Montgomery County Legislation | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Montgomery County Legislation |