House | 05/09/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 890 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 632 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 631 YIYM626-1 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered YIYM626-1 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary YIYM626-1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Judiciary 1st Amendment YIM7NNN-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |