Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 528 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 527 VAKZLPP-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Bedsole 1st Amendment Offered VAKZLPP-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 526 IQ8FWWW-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered IQ8FWWW-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Judiciary IQ8FWWW-1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Judiciary 1st Amendment JQ4VNYY-1 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |