HB430INTRODUCED Page 0 HB430 C11IJJJ-1 By Representatives Lee, Rehm, Sorrells (N & P) RFD: Local Legislation First Read: 09-Apr-24 1 2 3 4 5 C11IJJJ-1 03/06/2024 THR (L)THR 2024-932 Page 1 First Read: 09-Apr-24 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT Relating to Houston County; to amend Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975; to further provide for the compensation of the sheriff. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA: Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, is amended to read as follows: "ยง45-35-70 (a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation of the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be adjusted so that the monthly compensation paid to the holder of the office shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation which was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on April 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this subdivision shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise provided by law, at which time the amount of the expense allowance shall be included in the base salary for the office holder and the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions from the expense allowance provided in this subsection shall be made in the same manner as if the expense allowance were salary as 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 HB430 INTRODUCED Page 2 the same manner as if the expense allowance were salary as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11. (2)a. Beginning on April 1, 2022June 1, 2024, the annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County shall be one hundred twenty thirty thousand eight hundred dollars ($120,000)($130,800). The annual salary shall only be adjusted thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. The increase in compensation provided by this subdivision over the salary of the sheriff existing before April 1, 2022June 1, 2024, shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise provided by law, at which time that amount shall be included in the base salary for the sheriff, and the expense allowance shall be void. b. Beginning June 1, 2024, in addition to the salary provided in paragraph a., the sheriff shall receive the same uniform increases in compensation, including cost-of-living or other similar increases granted to other county employees. During a term of the sheriff, the uniform increases shall be paid as an additional expense allowance, and effective beginning the next term of office, the cumulative expense allowance during the term shall be converted to salary. (3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the expense allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston County Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1), shall only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. (b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on December 1, 2004, including any additional increases 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 HB430 INTRODUCED Page 3 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter 2A, Title 11, is ratified and confirmed and shall continue to be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston County Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11. (2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for performing duties within Houston County. (3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for performing duties within the county. The expense allowance provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same manner as all other compensation and expense allowances received by the chair of the county commission." Section 2. This act shall become effective on June 1, 2024. 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 71 72 73 74 75 76 77 78 79