Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB430 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/02/2024

                            HB430ENROLLED
Page 0
HB430
C11IJJJ-2
By Representatives Lee, Rehm, Sorrells (N & P)
RFD: Local Legislation
First Read: 09-Apr-24
1
2
3
4
5 HB430 Enrolled
Page 1
First Read: 09-Apr-24
Enrolled, An Act,
Relating to Houston County; to amend Section 45-35-70,
Code of Alabama 1975; to further provide for the compensation
of the sheriff.
BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, is
amended to read as follows:
"ยง45-35-70
(a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation of
the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be adjusted
so that the monthly compensation paid to the holder of the
office shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation which
was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on April
1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this subdivision
shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the
beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise provided
by law, at which time the amount of the expense allowance
shall be included in the base salary for the office holder and
the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions from the
expense allowance provided in this subsection shall be made in
the same manner as if the expense allowance were salary as
provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
(2)a. Beginning on April 1, 2022June 1, 2024, the
annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County shall be one
hundred twenty thirty thousand eight hundred dollars
($120,000)($130,800). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. The increase
in compensation provided by this subdivision over the salary
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 HB430 Enrolled
Page 2
in compensation provided by this subdivision over the salary
of the sheriff existing before April 1, 2022June 1, 2024,
shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the
beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise provided
by law, at which time that amount shall be included in the
base salary for the sheriff, and the expense allowance shall
be void.
b. Beginning June 1, 2024, in addition to the salary
provided in paragraph a., the sheriff shall receive the same
uniform increases in compensation, including cost-of-living or
other similar increases granted to other county employees.
During a term of the sheriff, the uniform increases shall be
paid as an additional expense allowance, and effective
beginning the next term of office, the cumulative expense
allowance during the term shall be converted to salary.
(3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the expense
allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston County
Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1), shall
only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
(b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
2A, Title 11, is ratified and confirmed and shall continue to
be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston County
Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47
48
49
50
51
52
53
54
55
56 HB430 Enrolled
Page 3
in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
(2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
performing duties within Houston County.
(3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
received by the chair of the county commission."
Section 2. This act shall become effective on June 1,
2024.
57
58
59
60
61
62
63
64
65
66
67
68
69
70
71
72 HB430 Enrolled
Page 4
2024.
________________________________________________
Speaker of the House of Representatives
________________________________________________
President and Presiding Officer of the Senate
House of Representatives
I hereby certify that the within Act originated in and
was passed by the House 16-Apr-24.
John Treadwell
Clerk
Senate           02-May-24           	Passed
73
74
75
76
77
78
79
80
81
82
83
84
85
86
87
88
89
90
91
92
93
94
95
96
97
98
99
100
101
102
103