Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB430 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HB430ENROLLED
1+HB430INTRODUCED
22 Page 0
33 HB430
4-C11IJJJ-2
4+C11IJJJ-1
55 By Representatives Lee, Rehm, Sorrells (N & P)
66 RFD: Local Legislation
77 First Read: 09-Apr-24
88 1
99 2
1010 3
1111 4
12-5 HB430 Enrolled
12+5 C11IJJJ-1 03/06/2024 THR (L)THR 2024-932
1313 Page 1
1414 First Read: 09-Apr-24
15-Enrolled, An Act,
15+A BILL
16+TO BE ENTITLED
17+AN ACT
1618 Relating to Houston County; to amend Section 45-35-70,
1719 Code of Alabama 1975; to further provide for the compensation
1820 of the sheriff.
1921 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
2022 Section 1. Section 45-35-70, Code of Alabama 1975, is
2123 amended to read as follows:
2224 "ยง45-35-70
2325 (a)(1) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the compensation of
2426 the Chair of the Houston County Commission shall be adjusted
2527 so that the monthly compensation paid to the holder of the
2628 office shall be 85 percent of the monthly compensation which
2729 was being paid to the Houston County Judge of Probate on April
2830 1, 2007. The increase in compensation in this subdivision
2931 shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the
3032 beginning of the next term of office or as otherwise provided
3133 by law, at which time the amount of the expense allowance
3234 shall be included in the base salary for the office holder and
3335 the expense allowance shall be void. Deductions from the
3436 expense allowance provided in this subsection shall be made in
3537 the same manner as if the expense allowance were salary as
36-provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
37-(2)a. Beginning on April 1, 2022June 1, 2024, the
38-annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County shall be one
39-hundred twenty thirty thousand eight hundred dollars
40-($120,000)($130,800). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
41-thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. The increase
42-in compensation provided by this subdivision over the salary
4338 1
4439 2
4540 3
4641 4
4742 5
4843 6
4944 7
5045 8
5146 9
5247 10
5348 11
5449 12
5550 13
5651 14
5752 15
5853 16
5954 17
6055 18
6156 19
6257 20
6358 21
6459 22
6560 23
6661 24
6762 25
6863 26
6964 27
70-28 HB430 Enrolled
65+28 HB430 INTRODUCED
7166 Page 2
67+the same manner as if the expense allowance were salary as
68+provided in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
69+(2)a. Beginning on April 1, 2022June 1, 2024, the
70+annual salary of the Sheriff of Houston County shall be one
71+hundred twenty thirty thousand eight hundred dollars
72+($120,000)($130,800). The annual salary shall only be adjusted
73+thereafter as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11. The increase
7274 in compensation provided by this subdivision over the salary
7375 of the sheriff existing before April 1, 2022June 1, 2024,
7476 shall be paid as a monthly expense allowance until the
7577 beginning of the next term of office, or as otherwise provided
7678 by law, at which time that amount shall be included in the
7779 base salary for the sheriff, and the expense allowance shall
7880 be void.
7981 b. Beginning June 1, 2024, in addition to the salary
8082 provided in paragraph a., the sheriff shall receive the same
8183 uniform increases in compensation, including cost-of-living or
8284 other similar increases granted to other county employees.
8385 During a term of the sheriff, the uniform increases shall be
8486 paid as an additional expense allowance, and effective
8587 beginning the next term of office, the cumulative expense
8688 allowance during the term shall be converted to salary.
8789 (3) After May 31, 2007, any adjustments in the expense
8890 allowance or compensation of the Chair of the Houston County
8991 Commission other than as provided in subdivision (1), shall
9092 only be as authorized in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
9193 (b)(1) The compensation being paid to the district
9294 commissioners of the Houston County Commission commencing on
9395 December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
94-thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
95-2A, Title 11, is ratified and confirmed and shall continue to
96-be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston County
97-Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
98-compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
99-only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
100-in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
10196 29
10297 30
10398 31
10499 32
105100 33
106101 34
107102 35
108103 36
109104 37
110105 38
111106 39
112107 40
113108 41
114109 42
115110 43
116111 44
117112 45
118113 46
119114 47
120115 48
121116 49
122117 50
123118 51
124119 52
125120 53
126121 54
127122 55
128-56 HB430 Enrolled
123+56 HB430 INTRODUCED
129124 Page 3
125+December 1, 2004, including any additional increases
126+thereafter provided as a result of the application of Chapter
127+2A, Title 11, is ratified and confirmed and shall continue to
128+be the amounts paid to all members of the Houston County
129+Commission elected by district after May 31, 2007. The
130+compensation of the district commissioners shall thereafter
131+only be altered as provided in subdivision (2) or as provided
130132 in Chapter 2A, Title 11.
131133 (2) Beginning on June 1, 2007, the district
132134 commissioners in Houston County shall each receive a monthly
133135 expense allowance in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars
134136 ($250) per month in lieu of mileage reimbursement for
135137 performing duties within Houston County.
136138 (3) Beginning on December 1, 2018, the Chair of the
137139 Houston County Commission shall receive an expense allowance
138140 in the amount of five hundred dollars ($500) per month for
139141 performing duties within the county. The expense allowance
140142 provided in this subsection shall be in lieu of mileage
141143 reimbursement or the chair being provided the use of a county
142144 vehicle. This expense allowance shall be treated in the same
143145 manner as all other compensation and expense allowances
144146 received by the chair of the county commission."
145147 Section 2. This act shall become effective on June 1,
146148 2024.
147149 57
148150 58
149151 59
150152 60
151153 61
152154 62
153155 63
154156 64
155157 65
156158 66
157159 67
158160 68
159161 69
160162 70
161163 71
162-72 HB430 Enrolled
163-Page 4
164-2024.
165-________________________________________________
166-Speaker of the House of Representatives
167-________________________________________________
168-President and Presiding Officer of the Senate
169-House of Representatives
170-I hereby certify that the within Act originated in and
171-was passed by the House 16-Apr-24.
172-John Treadwell
173-Clerk
174-Senate 02-May-24 Passed
164+72
175165 73
176166 74
177167 75
178168 76
179169 77
180170 78
181171 79
182-80
183-81
184-82
185-83
186-84
187-85
188-86
189-87
190-88
191-89
192-90
193-91
194-92
195-93
196-94
197-95
198-96
199-97
200-98
201-99
202-100
203-101
204-102
205-103