Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB76 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-HB76ENROLLED
1+HB76INTRODUCED
22 Page 0
33 HB76
4-RETLYMN-2
4+RETLYMN-1
55 By Representative Ingram (N & P)
66 RFD: Local Legislation
77 First Read: 06-Feb-24
88 PFD: 01-Feb-24
99 1
1010 2
1111 3
1212 4
1313 5
14-6 HB76 Enrolled
14+6 RETLYMN-1 11/21/2023 THR (L)THR 2023-3388
1515 Page 1
1616 PFD: 01-Feb-24
17-Enrolled, An Act,
17+A BILL
18+TO BE ENTITLED
19+AN ACT
1820 Relating to Elmore County; to amend Sections
1921 45-26-81.01, 45-26-230.01, and 45-26-242.01, Code of Alabama
2022 1975; to further provide for the compensation of the judge of
2123 probate, sheriff, and revenue commissioner; and to repeal
2224 Section 45-26-81, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the salary
2325 of the judge of probate.
2426 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
2527 Section 1. Sections 45-26-81.01, 45-26-230.01, and
2628 45-26-242.01, Code of Alabama 1975, are amended to read as
2729 follows:
2830 "§45-26-81.01
2931 (a) Effective on July 1, 2020, the The base annual
3032 salary of the Judge of Probate of Elmore County shall be
3133 ninety-eight thousand dollars ($98,000) one hundred twenty
3234 thousand dollars ($120,000) per year, payable in equal monthly
3335 installments from the general fund the same manner and at the
3436 same time as other employees of the county. The salary
3537 provided by this section shall supersede any salary, expense
3638 allowance, or other compensation provided to the judge of
3739 probate prior to July 1, 2020 .
38-(b) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to any
39-other compensation provided to the judge of probate, the judge
40-of probate shall continue after July 1, 2020, to receive any
41-cost-of-living or other salary increases granted to county
42-employees or elected officials in the county and as approved
43-by the county commission or any salary increases as otherwise
44-granted and approved by the county commission."
4540 1
4641 2
4742 3
4843 4
4944 5
5045 6
5146 7
5247 8
5348 9
5449 10
5550 11
5651 12
5752 13
5853 14
5954 15
6055 16
6156 17
6257 18
6358 19
6459 20
6560 21
6661 22
6762 23
6863 24
6964 25
7065 26
7166 27
72-28 HB76 Enrolled
67+28 HB76 INTRODUCED
7368 Page 2
69+probate prior to July 1, 2020 .
70+(b) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to any
71+other compensation provided to the judge of probate, the judge
72+of probate shall continue after July 1, 2020, to receive any
73+cost-of-living or other salary increases granted to county
74+employees or elected officials in the county and as approved
75+by the county commission or any salary increases as otherwise
7476 granted and approved by the county commission."
7577 "§45-26-230.01
7678 Commencing on the first day of the next term of office
7779 after April 1, 2018, the Sheriff of Elmore County shall
7880 receive a salary in the amount of one hundred fifteen thousand
7981 dollars ($115,000) per year.
8082 (a) The Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary
8183 in the amount of one hundred twenty thousand dollars
8284 ($120,000) per year.
8385 (b) Any individual who has previously served one full
8486 term as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary in the
8587 amount of one hundred thirty thousand dollars ($130,000) per
8688 year.
8789 (c) Any individual who has previously served two full
8890 terms as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary in
8991 the amount of one hundred forty thousand dollars ($140,000)
9092 per year.
9193 (d) Any individual who has previously served three or
9294 more full terms as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a
9395 salary in the amount of one hundred fifty thousand dollars
9496 ($150,000) per year.
9597 (e) The salary salaries provided by this section shall
96-be in lieu of any other salary provided by general or local
97-law and shall be paid in the same manner and at the same time
98-as other county employees."
99-"§45-26-242.01
100-(a) Effective on July 1, 2020, the revenue commissioner
101-shall receive an annual expense allowance of sixteen thousand
102-dollars ($16,000) per year payable in equal monthly
10398 29
10499 30
105100 31
106101 32
107102 33
108103 34
109104 35
110105 36
111106 37
112107 38
113108 39
114109 40
115110 41
116111 42
117112 43
118113 44
119114 45
120115 46
121116 47
122117 48
123118 49
124119 50
125120 51
126121 52
127122 53
128123 54
129124 55
130-56 HB76 Enrolled
125+56 HB76 INTRODUCED
131126 Page 3
127+(e) The salary salaries provided by this section shall
128+be in lieu of any other salary provided by general or local
129+law and shall be paid in the same manner and at the same time
130+as other county employees."
131+"§45-26-242.01
132+(a) Effective on July 1, 2020, the revenue commissioner
133+shall receive an annual expense allowance of sixteen thousand
132134 dollars ($16,000) per year payable in equal monthly
133135 installments from the general fund of the county until
134136 September 30, 2021. The expense allowance shall be in addition
135137 to all other compensation and benefits granted the revenue
136138 commissioner and may be treated as compensation for retirement
137139 purposes. Effective October 1, 2021, the expense allowance
138140 provided by this subsection shall be repealed.
139141 (b)(a)Effective on October 1, 2021, the The revenue
140142 commissioner shall receive a base annual salary of ninety-five
141143 thousand dollars ($95,000) one hundred twenty thousand dollars
142144 ($120,000) per year payable in equal monthly installments as
143145 provided by law, plus any additional compensation provided by
144146 general law pursuant to subdivision (3) of Section 11-2A-3 the
145147 same manner and at the same time as other employees of the
146148 county. The salary provided by this subsection shall supersede
147149 any salary, expense allowance, or other compensation provided
148150 to the revenue commissioner prior to July 1, 2020 .
149151 (c)(b) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to
150152 any other compensation provided to the revenue commissioner,
151153 the revenue commissioner shall continue after July 1, 2020, to
152154 receive any cost-of-living or other salary increases granted
153155 to county employees or elected officials in the county and as
154-approved by the county commission or any salary increases as
155-otherwise granted and approved by the county commission."
156-Section 2. Section 45-26-81, Code of Alabama 1975,
157-relating to the salary of the judge of probate, is repealed.
158-Section 3. This act shall become effective on October
159-1, 2024.
160156 57
161157 58
162158 59
163159 60
164160 61
165161 62
166162 63
167163 64
168164 65
169165 66
170166 67
171167 68
172168 69
173169 70
174170 71
175171 72
176172 73
177173 74
178174 75
179175 76
180176 77
181177 78
182178 79
183179 80
184180 81
185181 82
186-83 HB76 Enrolled
182+83
183+84 HB76 INTRODUCED
187184 Page 4
185+to county employees or elected officials in the county and as
186+approved by the county commission or any salary increases as
187+otherwise granted and approved by the county commission."
188+Section 2. Section 45-26-81, Code of Alabama 1975,
189+relating to the salary of the judge of probate, is repealed.
190+Section 3. This act shall become effective on October
188191 1, 2024.
189-________________________________________________
190-Speaker of the House of Representatives
191-________________________________________________
192-President and Presiding Officer of the Senate
193-House of Representatives
194-I hereby certify that the within Act originated in and
195-was passed by the House 21-Feb-24.
196-John Treadwell
197-Clerk
198-Senate 25-Apr-24 Passed
199-84
200192 85
201193 86
202194 87
203195 88
204196 89
205197 90
206-91
207-92
208-93
209-94
210-95
211-96
212-97
213-98
214-99
215-100
216-101
217-102
218-103
219-104
220-105
221-106
222-107
223-108
224-109
225-110
226-111
227-112
228-113
229-114