Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama House Bill HB76 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/25/2024

                            HB76ENROLLED
Page 0
HB76
RETLYMN-2
By Representative Ingram (N & P)
RFD: Local Legislation
First Read: 06-Feb-24
PFD: 01-Feb-24
1
2
3
4
5
6 HB76 Enrolled
Page 1
PFD: 01-Feb-24
Enrolled, An Act,
Relating to Elmore County; to amend Sections
45-26-81.01, 45-26-230.01, and 45-26-242.01, Code of Alabama
1975; to further provide for the compensation of the judge of
probate, sheriff, and revenue commissioner; and to repeal
Section 45-26-81, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the salary
of the judge of probate.
BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA:
Section 1. Sections 45-26-81.01, 45-26-230.01, and
45-26-242.01, Code of Alabama 1975, are amended to read as
follows:
"§45-26-81.01
(a) Effective on July 1, 2020, the The base annual
salary of the Judge of Probate of Elmore County shall be
ninety-eight thousand dollars ($98,000) one hundred twenty
thousand dollars ($120,000) per year, payable in equal monthly
installments from the general fund the same manner and at the
same time as other employees of the county. The salary
provided by this section shall supersede any salary, expense
allowance, or other compensation provided to the judge of
probate prior to July 1, 2020 .
(b) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to any
other compensation provided to the judge of probate, the judge
of probate shall continue after July 1, 2020, to receive any
cost-of-living or other salary increases granted to county
employees or elected officials in the county and as approved
by the county commission or any salary increases as otherwise
granted and approved by the county commission."
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28 HB76 Enrolled
Page 2
granted and approved by the county commission."
"§45-26-230.01
Commencing on the first day of the next term of office
after April 1, 2018, the Sheriff of Elmore County shall
receive a salary in the amount of one hundred fifteen thousand
dollars ($115,000) per year. 
(a) The Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary
in the amount of one hundred twenty thousand dollars
($120,000) per year.
(b) Any individual who has previously served one full
term as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary in the
amount of one hundred thirty thousand dollars ($130,000) per
year.
(c) Any individual who has previously served two full
terms as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a salary in
the amount of one hundred forty thousand dollars ($140,000)
per year.
(d) Any individual who has previously served three or
more full terms as Sheriff of Elmore County shall receive a
salary in the amount of one hundred fifty thousand dollars
($150,000) per year.
(e) The salary salaries provided by this section shall
be in lieu of any other salary provided by general or local
law and shall be paid in the same manner and at the same time
as other county employees."
"§45-26-242.01
(a) Effective on July 1, 2020, the revenue commissioner
shall receive an annual expense allowance of sixteen thousand
dollars ($16,000) per year payable in equal monthly
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47
48
49
50
51
52
53
54
55
56 HB76 Enrolled
Page 3
dollars ($16,000) per year payable in equal monthly
installments from the general fund of the county until
September 30, 2021. The expense allowance shall be in addition
to all other compensation and benefits granted the revenue
commissioner and may be treated as compensation for retirement
purposes. Effective October 1, 2021, the expense allowance
provided by this subsection shall be repealed.
(b)(a)Effective on October 1, 2021, the The revenue
commissioner shall receive a base annual salary of ninety-five
thousand dollars ($95,000) one hundred twenty thousand dollars
($120,000) per year payable in equal monthly installments as
provided by law, plus any additional compensation provided by
general law pursuant to subdivision (3) of Section 11-2A-3 the
same manner and at the same time as other employees of the
county. The salary provided by this subsection shall supersede
any salary, expense allowance, or other compensation provided
to the revenue commissioner prior to July 1, 2020 .
(c)(b) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to
any other compensation provided to the revenue commissioner,
the revenue commissioner shall continue after July 1, 2020, to
receive any cost-of-living or other salary increases granted
to county employees or elected officials in the county and as
approved by the county commission or any salary increases as
otherwise granted and approved by the county commission."
Section 2. Section 45-26-81, Code of Alabama 1975,
relating to the salary of the judge of probate, is repealed.
Section 3. This act shall become effective on October
1, 2024.
57
58
59
60
61
62
63
64
65
66
67
68
69
70
71
72
73
74
75
76
77
78
79
80
81
82
83 HB76 Enrolled
Page 4
1, 2024.
________________________________________________
Speaker of the House of Representatives
________________________________________________
President and Presiding Officer of the Senate
House of Representatives
I hereby certify that the within Act originated in and
was passed by the House 21-Feb-24.
John Treadwell
Clerk
Senate           25-Apr-24           	Passed
84
85
86
87
88
89
90
91
92
93
94
95
96
97
98
99
100
101
102
103
104
105
106
107
108
109
110
111
112
113
114