Senate | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 962 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Gudger motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 961 BPWFQ4Q-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Gudger 1st Amendment Offered BPWFQ4Q-1 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Pending Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 59 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Prefiled |