House | 03/08/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Reported from RULES from Senate RULES | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Pending Senate RULES | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Senate committee on RULES | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Lovvorn motion to Adopt - Adopted Voice Vote | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Reported from RULES from House RULES | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Pending House RULES | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Received in the House and referred to the House committee on RULES |