Senate | 05/17/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1115 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Pending House Mobile County Legislation | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 617 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 616 ZN89KKR-1 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Mobile County Legislation 1st Substitute Offered ZN89KKR-1 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Committee Substitute Adopted ZN89KKR-1 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Pending Senate Mobile County Legislation | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation |