House
|
05/17/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Pending with Executive Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reed Concur In and Adopt House Amendment - Adopted Roll Call 1049
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1147
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1146 YQZF2N6-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Hall 1st Amendment Offered YQZF2N6-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1145 9LDCMPM-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Garrett 1st Amendment Offered 9LDCMPM-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1145
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1144 8PECFH2-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered 8PECFH2-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Education Policy 8PECFH2-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Education Policy 1st Amendment E4VM929-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Pending House Education Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 301
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 300 QU69545-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Orr 1st Substitute Offered QU69545-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending Senate Education Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|