House | 04/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 272 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Jones motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 271 JQKBYNF-1 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Veterans and Military Affairs 1st Amendment Offered JQKBYNF-1 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Veterans and Military Affairs 1st Amendment JQKBYNF-1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |