Senate | 05/09/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1030 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 291 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Chesteen motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 290 FYUTD55-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Education Policy 1st Amendment Offered FYUTD55-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Education Policy 1st Amendment FYUTD55-1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Pending Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |