Senate | 05/09/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1083 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Pending House Health | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 435 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |