Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reed Concur In and Adopt House Amendment - Adopted Roll Call 1023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1088
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1087 1C5VZ33-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
County and Municipal Government 1st Substitute Offered 1C5VZ33-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
County and Municipal Government 1st Substitute 1C5VZ33-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Pending House County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 603
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 602 IG5B6WW-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Orr 1st Substitute Offered IG5B6WW-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Pending Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|