Senate | 05/09/2024 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 953 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 952 CFA7QJJ-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 951 LT21AYA-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 950 V5RFPVV-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures 3rd Amendment Offered CFA7QJJ-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures 2nd Amendment Offered LT21AYA-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures 1st Amendment Offered V5RFPVV-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Figures motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 949 RKLAMYY-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute Offered RKLAMYY-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Substitute RKLAMYY-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |