Senate | 05/20/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1179 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Pending House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 767 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Elliott motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 766 MMQDW11-1 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment Offered MMQDW11-1 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment MMQDW11-1 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |