Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 213
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 212 98LQMMP-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
EP Reported Substitute Offered from House Education Policy 98LQMMP-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 98LQMMP-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted TVCJ919-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending House Education Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 17 7PTMVVV-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Singleton Amendment Offered 7PTMVVV-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending Senate Education Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy
|
|
|