Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SR47 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 SR47INTRODUCED
22 Page 0
33 SR47
44 BNU2QJ4-1
55 By Senator Waggoner
66 RFD:
77 First Read: 11-Apr-24
88 1
99 2
1010 3
1111 4
1212 5 - 2 -
1313 First Read: 11-Apr-24
1414 BNU2QJ4-1
1515 SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
1616 Thursday, April 11, 2024
1717 SR _____ SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
1818 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE OF THE LEGISLATURE OF
1919 ALABAMA, That immediately upon the adoption of this
2020 resolution, the following business, in the order set forth
2121 below, shall be the special and paramount order of business
2222 for the twenty first legislative day taking precedence over
2323 the regular order of business or any pending or unfinished
2424 business.
2525 Introduction of Bills
2626 House Messages
2727 Reports from Standing Committees
2828 Motions and Resolutions
2929 Page
3030 Senator Albritton:
3131 29
3232 SB70
3333 Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations
3434 plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and
3535 end-of-year reports required.
3636 Senator Albritton:
3737 30
3838 SB69
3939 Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year
4040 ending September 30, 2025, use of allocation pursuant to
4141 Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues
4242 deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt.
4343 Senator Albritton:
4444 31
4545 SB68
4646 State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year
4747 beginning October 1, 2024
4848 1
4949 2
5050 3
5151 4
5252 5
5353 6
5454 7
5555 8
5656 9
5757 10
5858 11
5959 12
6060 13
6161 14
6262 15
6363 16
6464 17
6565 18
6666 19
6767 20
6868 21
6969 22
7070 23
7171 24
7272 25
7373 26
7474 27
7575 28
7676 29
7777 30
7878 31
7979 32
8080 33
8181 34
8282 35
8383 36
8484 37
8585 38
8686 39
8787 40
8888 41
8989 42
9090 43
9191 44
9292 45
9393 46
9494 47 SR47 INTRODUCED
9595 - 3 -
9696 beginning October 1, 2024
9797 Senator Albritton:
9898 32
9999 SB66
100100 Supplemental appropriations from State General Fund to
101101 specified agencies for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
102102 Senator Albritton:
103103 31
104104 SB67
105105 Appropriations from State General Fund for executive,
106106 legislative, and judicial agencies of the State, other
107107 functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for
108108 fiscal year ending September 30, 2025.
109109 Senator Givhan:
110110 4
111111 SB116
112112 Alabama Onsite Wastewater Board, continued until October 1,
113113 2025, with modification to allow an organizational meeting to
114114 be considered a regular meeting of the board, pursuant to the
115115 Sunset Law
116116 Senators Kelley, Kitchens, Jones, Sessions, Williams, Weaver,
117117 Chesteen and Elliott:
118118 42
119119 SB258
120120 Commercial driver licenses, updated to conform to Federal
121121 Motor Carrier Safety Administration regulations
122122 Representatives Pettus, Treadaway, Bedsole and Lee:
123123 20
124124 HB127
125125 Crimes and offenses; unlawful to tamper with electronic
126126 monitoring device; crime created; penalties created
127127 Representative Pringle:
128128 11
129129 HB10
130130 Crimes and offenses, to further provide for the crime of
131131 manslaughter
132132 48
133133 49
134134 50
135135 51
136136 52
137137 53
138138 54
139139 55
140140 56
141141 57
142142 58
143143 59
144144 60
145145 61
146146 62
147147 63
148148 64
149149 65
150150 66
151151 67
152152 68
153153 69
154154 70
155155 71
156156 72
157157 73
158158 74
159159 75
160160 76
161161 77
162162 78
163163 79
164164 80
165165 81
166166 82
167167 83
168168 84
169169 85
170170 86
171171 87
172172 88
173173 89
174174 90
175175 91
176176 92
177177 93
178178 94 SR47 INTRODUCED
179179 - 4 -
180180 Senators Hatcher, Jones, Smitherman, Butler, Allen, Givhan,
181181 Melson, Sessions, Carnley, Bell, Kelley, Shelnutt, Kitchens,
182182 Stutts, Elliott, Roberts, Waggoner, Orr, Stewart, Coleman,
183183 Coleman-Madison and Beasley:
184184 45
185185 SB207
186186 Interstate compact; dieticians
187187 Representatives Woods, Stadthagen, Underwood, Shedd, Crawford,
188188 Brinyark, Gidley, Lamb, Bolton, Starnes, Shaver, DuBose, Shaw,
189189 Shirey, Givens, Holk-Jones, Fidler, Stubbs, Colvin, Ingram,
190190 Carns, Bedsole, Treadaway, Estes, Stringer, Hammett, Faulkner,
191191 Hulsey, Wilcox, Wood, Simpson, Moore, Kiel, Rigsby, Butler,
192192 Harrison, Pettus, Sells, Hill, Mooney, Fincher, Rehm,
193193 Standridge, Whorton and Wood:
194194 12
195195 HB168
196196 Crimes & Offenses, raises max. age for offenses involving
197197 obscene materials with depictions of children, authorizes
198198 punitive damages for victims of those offenses, and directs
199199 Board of Ed. to require policies related to those offenses
200200 Senators Livingston, Gudger, Shelnutt, Butler, Weaver,
201201 Carnley, Williams, Bell, Elliott, Price, Allen, Sessions,
202202 Stutts, Chambliss, Chesteen, Melson and Albritton:
203203 41
204204 SB266
205205 Motor vehicles, maximum weights on state roads further
206206 provided
207207 Representative Givens:
208208 10
209209 HB42
210210 Sound of Freedom Act; human trafficking; minimum sentence of
211211 life imprisonment where victim is a minor
212212 95
213213 96
214214 97
215215 98
216216 99
217217 100
218218 101
219219 102
220220 103
221221 104
222222 105
223223 106
224224 107
225225 108
226226 109
227227 110
228228 111
229229 112
230230 113
231231 114
232232 115
233233 116
234234 117
235235 118
236236 119
237237 120
238238 121
239239 122
240240 123
241241 124
242242 125
243243 126
244244 127
245245 128
246246 129
247247 130
248248 131
249249 132
250250 133
251251 134
252252 135 SR47 INTRODUCED
253253 - 5 -
254254 Representatives Robertson, Stadthagen, Shedd, Crawford,
255255 Marques, Lawrence, Pettus, Brown, Fincher, Lipscomb, Shaw,
256256 Hammett, Butler, Harrison, Wadsworth, Whorton, Brinyark,
257257 Underwood, Sorrells, Fidler, Moore, Collins, Almond, Wood,
258258 Holk-Jones, Givens, Gidley, Starnes, Oliver, Travis, Colvin,
259259 Bolton, McCampbell, Treadaway, Stringer and Harbison:
260260 22
261261 HB156
262262 Candidates for municipal offices; exempt from certain FCPA
263263 reporting if contributions and expenditures remain below
264264 threshold level
265265 Senator Gudger:
266266 5
267267 SB138
268268 Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until
269269 October 1, 2028, without modification, pursuant to the Sunset
270270 Law
271271 Representatives Moore, Woods, Butler and Bedsole:
272272 37
273273 HB161
274274 Crimes & offenses, prohibits a person from creating a private
275275 image without consent
276276 Representative Chestnut:
277277 51
278278 HB2
279279 Dallas County Board of Education members compensation
280280 increase.
281281 136
282282 137
283283 138
284284 139
285285 140
286286 141
287287 142
288288 143
289289 144
290290 145
291291 146
292292 147
293293 148
294294 149
295295 150
296296 151
297297 152
298298 153
299299 154
300300 155
301301 156
302302 157
303303 158
304304 159
305305 160
306306 161
307307 162
308308 163
309309 164
310310 165
311311 166
312312 167
313313 168
314314 169
315315 170
316316 171
317317 172