Alabama 2024 Regular Session

Alabama Senate Bill SR47 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/11/2024

                            SR47INTRODUCED
Page 0
SR47
BNU2QJ4-1
By Senator Waggoner
RFD: 
First Read: 11-Apr-24
1
2
3
4
5 - 2 -
First Read: 11-Apr-24
BNU2QJ4-1
SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
Thursday, April 11, 2024
SR _____ SPECIAL ORDER CALENDAR
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE OF THE LEGISLATURE OF
ALABAMA, That immediately upon the adoption of this
resolution, the following business, in the order set forth
below, shall be the special and paramount order of business
for the twenty first legislative day taking precedence over
the regular order of business or any pending or unfinished
business.
Introduction of Bills
House Messages
Reports from Standing Committees
Motions and Resolutions
Page
Senator Albritton: 
29
SB70 
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations
plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and
end-of-year reports required.
Senator Albritton: 
30
SB69 
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year
ending September 30, 2025, use of allocation pursuant to
Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues
deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt.
Senator Albritton: 
31
SB68 
State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year
beginning October 1, 2024
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47 SR47 INTRODUCED
- 3 -
beginning October 1, 2024
Senator Albritton: 
32
SB66 
Supplemental appropriations from State General Fund to
specified agencies for fiscal year ending September 30, 2024.
Senator Albritton: 
31
SB67 
Appropriations from State General Fund for executive,
legislative, and judicial agencies of the State, other
functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for
fiscal year ending September 30, 2025.
Senator Givhan: 
4
SB116 
Alabama Onsite Wastewater Board, continued until October 1,
2025, with modification to allow an organizational meeting to
be considered a regular meeting of the board, pursuant to the
Sunset Law
Senators Kelley, Kitchens, Jones, Sessions, Williams, Weaver,
Chesteen and Elliott: 
42
SB258 
Commercial driver licenses, updated to conform to Federal
Motor Carrier Safety Administration regulations
Representatives Pettus, Treadaway, Bedsole and Lee: 
20
HB127 
Crimes and offenses; unlawful to tamper with electronic
monitoring device; crime created; penalties created
Representative Pringle: 
11
HB10 
Crimes and offenses, to further provide for the crime of
manslaughter
48
49
50
51
52
53
54
55
56
57
58
59
60
61
62
63
64
65
66
67
68
69
70
71
72
73
74
75
76
77
78
79
80
81
82
83
84
85
86
87
88
89
90
91
92
93
94 SR47 INTRODUCED
- 4 -
Senators Hatcher, Jones, Smitherman, Butler, Allen, Givhan,
Melson, Sessions, Carnley, Bell, Kelley, Shelnutt, Kitchens,
Stutts, Elliott, Roberts, Waggoner, Orr, Stewart, Coleman,
Coleman-Madison and Beasley: 
45
SB207 
Interstate compact; dieticians
Representatives Woods, Stadthagen, Underwood, Shedd, Crawford,
Brinyark, Gidley, Lamb, Bolton, Starnes, Shaver, DuBose, Shaw,
Shirey, Givens, Holk-Jones, Fidler, Stubbs, Colvin, Ingram,
Carns, Bedsole, Treadaway, Estes, Stringer, Hammett, Faulkner,
Hulsey, Wilcox, Wood, Simpson, Moore, Kiel, Rigsby, Butler,
Harrison, Pettus, Sells, Hill, Mooney, Fincher, Rehm,
Standridge, Whorton and Wood: 
12
HB168 
Crimes & Offenses, raises max. age for offenses involving
obscene materials with depictions of children, authorizes
punitive damages for victims of those offenses, and directs
Board of Ed. to require policies related to those offenses
Senators Livingston, Gudger, Shelnutt, Butler, Weaver,
Carnley, Williams, Bell, Elliott, Price, Allen, Sessions,
Stutts, Chambliss, Chesteen, Melson and Albritton: 
41
SB266 
Motor vehicles, maximum weights on state roads further
provided
Representative Givens: 
10
HB42 
Sound of Freedom Act; human trafficking; minimum sentence of
life imprisonment where victim is a minor
95
96
97
98
99
100
101
102
103
104
105
106
107
108
109
110
111
112
113
114
115
116
117
118
119
120
121
122
123
124
125
126
127
128
129
130
131
132
133
134
135 SR47 INTRODUCED
- 5 -
Representatives Robertson, Stadthagen, Shedd, Crawford,
Marques, Lawrence, Pettus, Brown, Fincher, Lipscomb, Shaw,
Hammett, Butler, Harrison, Wadsworth, Whorton, Brinyark,
Underwood, Sorrells, Fidler, Moore, Collins, Almond, Wood,
Holk-Jones, Givens, Gidley, Starnes, Oliver, Travis, Colvin,
Bolton, McCampbell, Treadaway, Stringer and Harbison: 
22
HB156 
Candidates for municipal offices; exempt from certain FCPA
reporting if contributions and expenditures remain below
threshold level
Senator Gudger: 
5
SB138 
Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until
October 1, 2028, without modification, pursuant to the Sunset
Law
Representatives Moore, Woods, Butler and Bedsole: 
37
HB161 
Crimes & offenses, prohibits a person from creating a private
image without consent
Representative Chestnut: 
51
HB2 
Dallas County Board of Education members compensation
increase.
136
137
138
139
140
141
142
143
144
145
146
147
148
149
150
151
152
153
154
155
156
157
158
159
160
161
162
163
164
165
166
167
168
169
170
171
172